UNITED KINGDOM ASSOCIATION OF BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUSTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The UK Association of Building Preservation Trusts (APT) was formed in 1989 to provide building preservation trusts (BPTs) with a forum to discuss common issues, pool ideas, share experiences and provide advice. APT assists building preservation trusts to save historic buildings for the enjoyment of future generations, thereby facilitating community-led regeneration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 November 1993: Standard registration
- 06 February 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 06 February 2017: Funds transferred to 1167662 HERITAGE TRUST NETWORK
- A P T (Working name)
- ASSOCIATION OF PRESERVATION TRUSTS (Working name)
- UKAPT (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.97k | £80.72k | £55.04k | £54.83k | £59.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.92k | £92.41k | £65.97k | £44.62k | £67.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 24 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 24 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 31 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 31 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 02 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 10 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 30 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 30 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE EFFECTIVENESS AND EFFICIENCY OF RELEVANT CHARITIES IN DIRECT FURTHERANCE OF THEIR OBJECTS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN THE ESTABLISHMENT ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT.FOR THIS PURPOSE "RELEVANT CHARITIES" SHALL MEAN CHARITIES ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF ANY BUILDING OR BUILDINGS STRUCTURE OR STRUCTURES OR MONUMENT OR MONUMENTS OF AESTHETIC ARCHITECTURAL ARCHAELOGICAL HISTORICAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL VALUE AND THEIR APPURTENANT GROUNDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window