Accounts and annual returns ALBURGH WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1028351
Charity reporting is overdue by 1373 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 277 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 277 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 643 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 643 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1008 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1008 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1373 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1373 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 14 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required