Financial history CALOW WOMEN'S CLUB

Charity number: 1029631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £8.82k £4.85k £4.84k £5.34k £11.34k
Total expenditure £8.06k £6.14k £3.77k £4.35k £11.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A