Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF BIDEFORD BRIDGE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1029875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £28.41k £14.97k £26.82k £24.39k £23.09k
Total expenditure £27.46k £13.11k £25.40k £19.85k £24.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.05k N/A N/A N/A