Accounts and annual returns THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF ULTRASOUND IN OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY

Charity number: 1030406
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 December 2024 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 06 December 2024 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window