Financial history THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF ULTRASOUND IN OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY

Charity number: 1030406
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.84m £2.17m £2.21m £2.98m £3.97m
Total expenditure £3.53m £2.54m £2.79m £3.84m £4.30m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £20 £520 £3.93k £3.87k £2.80k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £23.72k £25.34k £754 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.77m £2.11m £2.15m £2.77m £3.75m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £44.35k £37.99k £31.61k £187.14k £217.55k
Income - Other £24.22k £0 £0 £24.17k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.53m £2.54m £2.79m £3.84m £4.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £212.51k £202.53k £0 £354.31k £303.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0