Governing document THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF ULTRASOUND IN OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY
Charity number: 1030406

Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/06/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH BY PROMOTING THE SCIENCE OF ULTRASOUND IN OBSTETRICS AND GYAECOLOGY AND EDUCATION THEREIN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.