Trustees THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF ULTRASOUND IN OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY
Charity number: 1030406

Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. Laurent Salomon | Chair | 06 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mala Sibal | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Suresh Seshadri | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Meagher | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexandros Sotiriadis | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ritsuko Pu | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fatima Crispi Brillas | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr George Condous | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jessica Preisler Romanow | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Asma Khalil | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Prof. Liona Poon | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Reem Abu-Rustum | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Thomas Bourne | Trustee | 11 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Caterina Bilardo | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.