Accounts and annual returns TOWNEND PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1031307
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 12 June 2024 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 12 June 2024 378 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 02 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 March 2022 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 13 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required