Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF BLANDFORD BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 1032049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.44k £6.06k £5.37k £22.84k £13.15k
Total expenditure £8.88k £4.15k £8.36k £9.00k £11.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A