ASSEMBLIES OF GOD INCORPORATED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our objective is "the benefit of the public through the Advancement of the Christian religion ...in accordance with the Statement of Faith of...AoG..." which we do through our membership network of around 550 local churches. All are committed to connecting people to Jesus through various ministries, including work with children, youth & young adults as well as teaching, training & community work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£3,018,385
Donations and legacies | £1.24m | |
Charitable activities | £1.61m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £164.12k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,167,841
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.17m | |
Other | £0 |
£22,288 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £38,297 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.17m |
People

29 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
278 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- AOG (Working name)
- ASSEMBLIES OF GOD IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND INCORPORATED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK ANDREW WILTSHIRE | Chair | 15 March 2018 |
|
|||||||
Ian Derek Williams | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|||||||
Elaine Palmer-Taylor | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Rachael Ita | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Paul Weaver | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Eliana Whyte | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
GLYN BARRETT | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
Lukas Erich Dewhirst | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.20m | £2.19m | £4.42m | £3.08m | £3.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.01m | £1.69m | £2.34m | £2.91m | £3.17m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £26.06k | £38.30k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.55m | £1.30m | £2.02m | £1.70m | £1.24m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £642.04k | £512.40k | £973.80k | £1.28m | £1.61m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.25k | £19.92k | £10.76k | £94.24k | £164.12k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £352.97k | £1.42m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £44.03k | £111.38k | £462.22k | £38.24k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.01m | £1.69m | £2.34m | £2.91m | £3.17m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £24.83k | £11.16k | £11.49k | £12.60k | £13.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.67m | £1.63m | £482.24k | £479.39k | £469.21k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £207.97k | £219.81k | £243.45k | |
|
Other assets | £1.39m | £1.88m | £4.91m | £5.08m | £4.98m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £407.91k | £355.44k | £411.39k | £413.82k | £452.34k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/11/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/01/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/04/2014 as amended on 15 Mar 2018 as amended on 26 Sep 2018 as amended on 18 Feb 2019 as amended on 06 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE FELLOWSHIP OF ASSEMBLIES OF GOD AND TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF THE INDIVIDUAL CHURCHES WITHIN THE FELLOWSHIP IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH OF THE FELLOWSHIP OF ASSEMBLIES OF GOD AS APPROVED BY THE GENERAL COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME (THE “STATEMENT”) IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Assemblies Of God Great Britain
Arlington House
Bloom Street
Salford
Manchester
M3 6AJ
- Phone:
- 01777817663
- Email:
- info@aoggb.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window