Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF STURMINSTER NEWTON TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1032363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £149.03k £765 £133.43k £130.49k £127.78k
Total expenditure £116.16k £12.15k £113.90k £131.43k £115.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A