THE TYNEDALE TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Each week, a team of readers records the Hexham Courant, Tynedale's local newspaper, for distribution to blind and partially sighted people, and to other disabled people unable to read a printed newspaper. Recordings are copied onto memory sticks, and posted on Friday evenings. Listeners return the sticks to be re-used for the following week's recording. We normally have around 100 listeners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Northumberland
Governance
- 28 February 1994: Standard registration
- 10 April 2019: Funds received from 1092103 THE BLYTH AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER
- TTN (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Clegg | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
LORAINE OLIVER | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
NEVILLE PARKIN | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael BROADHURST | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ED TURNBULL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.15k | £6.07k | £4.54k | £3.15k | £1.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.89k | £6.45k | £1.40k | £2.84k | £3.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 June 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/10/1993 AS AMENDED ON 10/07/2012 as amended on 13 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR THE PARTIALLY-SIGHTED, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED MEDIA OR TACTILE READING MATTER TO RESIDENTS OF TYNEDALE AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
TYNEDALE AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Croft View
Ovingham
PRUDHOE
Northumberland
NE42 6AN
- Phone:
- 01661 835096
- Email:
- treas@ttnweb.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window