Financial history NCFE

Charity Number: 1034808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £36.13m £38.79m £39.10m £43.03m £48.60m
Total expenditure £32.32m £37.78m £41.91m £50.85m £50.23m
Income from government contracts N/A £696.73k £1.86m £615.98k £1.03m
Income from government grants £1.17m £295.61k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £1.19m £1.39m £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £33.30m £36.81m £38.14m £42.48m £48.00m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £465.00k £303.00k £423.00k £554.00k £593.00k
Income - Other £1.17m £296.00k £532.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £30.56m £35.70m £41.42m £50.78m £50.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.75m £2.08m £491.00k £74.00k £68.00k
Expenditure - Governance £134.00k £165.00k £134.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £54.00k £54.00k £90.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0