ST. CECILIA SINGERS OF GLOUCESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
High quality chamber choir singing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 17 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Bagnall | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Baskerville | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iain Robert Rhodes | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael Garland | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Bairbre Patricia Lloyd | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Susan Oliver | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Clare Evans | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.65k | £3.47k | £7.57k | £8.16k | £9.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.99k | £3.45k | £5.97k | £9.55k | £13.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JANUARY AS AMENDED 25 FEBRUARY 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grey Gables
Oakley Road
Cheltenham
Cheltenham
Gloucestershire
GL52 6NZ
- Phone:
- 07900902040
- Email:
- hevansabove@icloud.com
- Website:
-
WWW.SAINTCECILIASINGERS.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window