BATHEASTON YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1035473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education/Training, Arts/Culture, Sport/Recrecation for children and young people, also provides buildings, facilities and open space for all ages

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £20,757
Total expenditure: £19,897

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Somerset
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 March 1994: Standard registration
  • 21 December 2023: Funds received from 1035152 BATHEASTON NEIGHBOURHOOD GROUP
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS PAM BURCOMBE Chair
BATHEASTON LEISURE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Rev Jane Elizabeth Hoe Trustee 18 September 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BATHEASTON ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST WITH ST. CATHERINE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SWITHUN'S BATHFORD IN THE DIOCESE OF BATH & WELLS
Recently registered
ROBERT FRANCIS STANLEY MIMMACK Trustee 18 September 2024
THE BATHEASTON SOCIETY
Received: On time
BATHEASTON LEISURE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BATHEASTON ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST WITH ST. CATHERINE
Received: On time
Jonathan Kent Wood Trustee 18 September 2024
None on record
Tracey Louise Pike Trustee 09 June 2021
None on record
Maria Ann Bath Trustee 30 January 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.67k £31.06k £29.92k £8.22k £20.76k
Total expenditure £15.53k £13.82k £19.72k £15.86k £19.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.50k £21.43k £20.92k N/A £7.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
30 FORRESTER GREEN
COLERNE
CHIPPENHAM
SN14 8EB
Phone:
07901571224
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available