Trustees THE MUSEUM OF THE BROADS

Charity number: 1036734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir Peter John Bellet Dixon Trustee 24 April 2025
UK NATIONAL PARKS CHARITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Paul Stephen Chipperfield Trustee 24 April 2025
READ EASY NORFOLK
Received: On time
Michael Edwin Barnes Trustee 20 February 2025
None on record
Kathryn Dixon Trustee 11 April 2024
None on record
Piers Warner Trustee 11 March 2022
None on record
Christopher David Hingley Trustee 11 March 2022
PAINSHILL PARK TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Ruth Margaret Briant Trustee 16 July 2021
THE EDUCATORS TRUST
Received: 38 days late
Christopher Tooth Trustee 16 July 2021
None on record