Accounts and annual returns ROTARY JAIPUR LIMB PROJECT

Charity number: 1037735
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 31 October 2024 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 31 October 2024 184 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 15 July 2024 442 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 15 July 2024 442 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 February 2024 664 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 23 February 2024 664 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 November 2023 942 days late Download Open in new window