THE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE NORWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of study and activity groups for people no longer in/retired from full time employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 29 June 1994: Standard registration
- THE U3A NORWICH (Working name)
- U3A NORWICH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsay Hickey | Chair | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Andrew Fryer | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Peter Victor Threadkell | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Collette Rogers | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
KATHERINE BARBARA ANETTS | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Stephen Derry Osborn | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
Susan Catherine Elizabeth Sharples | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Verena Joan Carr | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.93k | £15.62k | £17.47k | £20.06k | £24.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.80k | £17.02k | £19.25k | £24.67k | £25.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 29 APRIL 1992, AMENDED 18 MAY 1994 AND 19TH APRIL 1995, AS AMENDED, NO DATE GIVEN AS AMENDED ON 21 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 20 Nov 2019 as amended on 09 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
NORWICH AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 NINHAMS COURT
NORWICH
NR2 1NX
- Phone:
- 07843766382
- Email:
- SECRETARY@U3ANOR.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window