CLEVELAND PHILHARMONIC CHOIR MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music making and promotion of classical music in the North East of England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 29 June 1994: Standard registration
- CLEVELAND PHILHARMONIC CHOIR (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Hinton | Chair | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Ruth Whittaker | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas David Wills | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Adelaide Louise Pickover | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Adam Sutcliffe | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Houston | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ricky Hallam | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOAN CARTER | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lizanne Allen | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE LOUISE NEAL | Trustee |
|
||||||
KATHRYN BEEVERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.97k | £7.93k | £26.58k | £41.34k | £30.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.65k | £9.32k | £34.34k | £56.95k | £26.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAY 1982 AS AMENDED 26 APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE,IMPROVE,DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS, AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
REDCAR AND CLEVELAND HARTLEPOOL MIDDLESBROUGH STOCKTON-ON-TEES
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 OAKTREE GROVE
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS18 5NG
- Phone:
- 01642656241
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window