THE DIOCESE OF ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON LOURDES PILGRIMAGE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furtherance of Roman Catholic religion, especially Our Lady of Lourdes and for the purpose of promoting and organising pilgrimages to Lourdes, raising funds for the sick, handicapped and their carers to enable them to participate in the pilgrimage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 01 August 1994: Standard registration
- 26 October 2018: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 26 October 2018: Funds transferred to 252878 ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON DIOCESAN TRUST
- DIOCESE OF ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON LOURDES PILGRIMAGE TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.97k | £56.57k | £124.70k | £96.35k | £112.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.59k | £74.29k | £101.99k | £122.65k | £121.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 23 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 23 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 10 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 19 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 24 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 06 October 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 JULY 1994
Charitable objects
1) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO HONOURING OUR LADY OF LOURDES AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROMOTING AND ORGANISING PILGRIMAGES TO LOURDES INCLUDING RAISING FUNDS TO SUBSIDISE SUCH PILGRIMAGES FOR THOSE WHO ARE SICK OR HANDICAPPED TOGETHER WITH THEIR CARER. 2) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A BURIAL GROUND FOR THE USE OF PILGRIMS WHO DIE WHILST VISITING LOURDES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window