Financial history THE ROYAL ANGLIAN REGIMENT MUSEUM

Charity number: 1039930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £71.09k £42.27k £38.91k £40.24k £64.88k
Total expenditure £56.60k £53.39k £51.38k £48.93k £61.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.90k £23.76k £22.31k £22.92k £46.93k