BACH NETWORK UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates under the title " Bach Network" as of 2018 Participation in international Bach gathering , Leipzig, 2023 and 2024 Biannual Dialogue Meeting, Madingley, Cambridge, 2022 and 2024 Facilitation of online and offline research topics as they arise between Bach scholars and students Website and publication of "Understanding Bach" and "Discussing Bach"
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
- City Of London
- Oxfordshire
- Germany
- Northern Ireland
- Poland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 November 1994: Standard registration
- BACH NETWORK UK (Working name)
- THE TURECK BACH RESEARCH FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Max Hin Yeung WONG | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr RICHARD D P JONES | Trustee | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JOHN BUTT OBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RUTH TATLOW BMUS PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER MENZIES SMAILL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.62k | £0 | £417 | £10.73k | £108 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.34k | £0 | £0 | £7.28k | £1.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 SEPTEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 18 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MUSIC, PARTICULARY THE MUSIC OF J S BACH IN ALL ITS ASPECTS INCLUDING ITS COMPOSITION AND APPRECIATION AND THE HISTORY, ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Currie Mains
Borthwick
Gorebridge
EH23 4RA
- Phone:
- 01875820757
- Email:
- info@bachnetwork.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window