Financial history GOOD NEWS FAMILY CARE (HOMES) LTD

Charity number: 1042386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £429.62k £555.90k £482.78k £430.43k £531.57k
Total expenditure £358.72k £456.81k £451.73k £427.68k £489.57k
Income from government contracts £20.00k £20.00k £87.70k £87.70k £50.78k
Income from government grants £67.36k £94.95k N/A N/A £40.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £262.64k N/A N/A £209.71k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £293.25k N/A N/A £319.40k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £8 N/A N/A £2.46k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £456.81k N/A N/A £489.31k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A £263
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.41k N/A N/A £7.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0