NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HEALTH PLAY SPECIALISTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of physical and mental well being of children and young people who are patients in hospital, hospice or receiving medical care at home by the promotion of high professional standards of play staff; to ensure the provision of appropriate theraputic and stimulating play facilities and support to those who carry out this work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 December 1994: Standard registration
- 04 November 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 04 November 2024: Funds transferred to 1205808 THE SOCIETY OF HEALTH PLAY SPECIALISTS
- N A H P S (Working name)
- NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HEALTH PLAYSPECIALISTS (Previous name)
- THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOSPITAL PLAY STAFF (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.25k | £15.40k | £6.52k | £7.88k | £12.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.61k | £10.27k | £2.11k | £3.65k | £6.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/07/1992 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/1994 AS AMENDED ON 22/07/2003 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELL BEING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE PATIENTS IN HOSPITAL HOSPICE OR RECEIVING MEDICAL CARE AT HOME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window