Financial history ST EDMUNDS AND ST MARY MAJOR CHARITY

Charity number: 1042648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £10.21k £10.47k £10.62k £11.08k £11.15k
Total expenditure £10.90k £10.26k £11.85k £11.15k £10.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A