TUDOR HALL SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of education to girls aged 3-18 and boys aged 3-11 in an environment which encourages the Christian faith and values.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£13,749,820
Donations and legacies | £108.96k | |
Charitable activities | £13.34m | |
Other trading activities | £264.70k | |
Investments | £37.94k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£14,159,322
Raising funds | £257.82k | |
Charitable activities | £13.90m | |
Other | £0 |
-£11,324 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £48,284 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £257.82k | |
Charitable expenditure | £13.90m |
People

252 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- TUDOR HALL (Working name)
- TUDOR HALL SCHOOL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON DARLING | Chair | 07 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Iona Hutchinson | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Kerry Jane Bartram | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sir Stephen John Gomersall KCMG | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Benjamin Paul Evans | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Karen Sarah Coles | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Countess Alexandra di Valmarana | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Rodney Style | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Holliday | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Sewell | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Alice Scarfe | Trustee | 24 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Paul Samuel Newsome | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Bowie | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.23m | £11.55m | £11.49m | £12.89m | £13.75m | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.12m | £11.80m | £11.98m | £13.17m | £14.16m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £48.28k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £513.78k | £13.17k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £269.17k | £604.05k | £59.33k | £426.55k | £108.96k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £206.35k | £5.60k | £52.28k | £79.73k | £264.70k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £11.73m | £10.91m | £11.22m | £12.36m | £13.34m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £31.05k | £29.67k | £22.94k | £22.37k | £37.94k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £165.00k | £16.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.83m | £11.71m | £11.84m | £13.01m | £13.90m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £285.29k | £88.60k | £143.13k | £95.20k | £257.82k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £20.13k | £20.13k | £29.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £64.31k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £20.97m | £20.15m | £19.39m | £18.96m | £18.52m | |
|
Long-term investments | £695.22k | £737.63k | £825.97k | £759.52k | £763.98k | |
|
Other assets | £1.91m | £2.06m | £2.41m | £1.70m | £1.41m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.15m | £6.73m | £6.82m | £5.96m | £5.66m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 NOVEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 9 NOVEMBER 2010 AND REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 JANUARY 2011. as amended on 14 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, CHRISTIAN RELIGION, AND OF OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS BY: MAINTAINING A SCHOOL AT WYKHAM PARK BANBURY OXFORDSHIRE PROVIDING A BROAD EDUCATION AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES FOR THE SPIRITUAL, ACADEMIC, CULTURAL, PHYSICAL, AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT OF PUPILS IN AN ENVIRONMENT WHICH ENCOURAGES THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND VALUES; ESTABLISHING, ACQUIRING OR MAINTAINING ANY OTHER SCHOOL ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES SET OUT IN ARTICLE 3.1; AND ADVANCING EDUCATION OR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE COMMUNITY RESIDENT NEAR ANY SCHOOL MAINTAINED BY THE SCHOOL OR ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WYKHAM PARK, BANBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tudor Hall School
Wykham Lane PARK
BANBURY
OX16 9UR
- Phone:
- 01295 263434
- Email:
- bursar@tudorhallschool.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window