ISLINGTON UNITED CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist those in need in the former Metropolitan Borough of Islington through an annual distribution of food vouchers through local churches, charities, organisations and local Councillors
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Islington
Governance
- 16 January 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip David Middleton | Chair | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Patrick Gilgunn | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah McHugh | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Havilland James de Sausmarez | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Carlyle Hughesdon | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Troy Gallagher | Trustee | 31 August 2020 |
|
|||||
ORIEL HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLINE SAFI NGONGO | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.56k | £12.78k | £14.18k | £15.22k | £15.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.37k | £16.73k | £16.48k | £18.56k | £17.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS OF 31 AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
TO PAY A YEARLY SUM OF ú50 OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE COMMISSIONERS FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE IN WRITING TO THE VERGER OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY, ISLINGTON AND TO PAY A YEARLY SUM OF ú25 OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE COMMISSIONERS FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE IN WRITING TO A MINISTER OF THE TRUSTEES CHOICE FOR PREACHING A SERMON IN THE CHURCH OF ST MARY, ISLINGTON ON CHRISTMAS DAY AND SUBJECT TO SUCH PAYMENTS AND TO THE PAYMENT OF EXPENSES THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (1) NOT EXCEEDING 12 PER CENT OF THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR RELIEF IN NEED FOR THE BENEFIT OF MARRIED MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OVER THE AGE OF 50 YEARS AND WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON (2) SUBJECT THERETO, THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR RELIEF IN NEED EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE SAID FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH (3) THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY FOR SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE OR UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO PROVIDE SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
ISLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Butterfield Road
Wheathampstead
ST. ALBANS
AL4 8QH
- Phone:
- 07982624512
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window