THE BRITISH MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society is particularly concerned with lesser known British composers from the late 1800s to the middle years of the 20th Century. It is not generally a grant giving or commissioning body. The society issues a newsletter, journal and occasionally other books. It professionally records CDs. Its annual meetings usually incorporate some live music or other event.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 February 1995: Standard registration
- B M S (Working name)
- BRITISH MUSIC SOCIETY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN MAXWELL | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr WENDY FAYE HISCOCKS | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|||||
JOHN STANLEY GIBBONS | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN TROWELL | Trustee | 22 October 1994 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Trowell | Trustee | 22 October 1994 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.34k | £12.82k | £11.63k | £786 | £10.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.59k | £12.16k | £11.03k | £81 | £12.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 March 2025 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 March 2024 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 January 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED 24 FEBRUARY 2007 AND ORDER DATED 14 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BRITISH MUSIC WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO PROMOTION OF THE MUSIC OF BRITISH COMPOSERS, ALIVE OR DEAD PAST 1850, WHO DO NOT HAVE SOCIETIES DEVOTED TO THE PROMOTION OF THEIR MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 TUDOR GARDENS
UPMINSTER
RM14 3DE
- Phone:
- 01708224795
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window