Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST FIMBARRUS CHURCH FOWEY

Charity Number: 1044194
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.48k £3.99k £5.08k £3.71k £3.01k
Total expenditure £130 £137 £145 £154 £154
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A