Trustees GOLDSMITHS CHORAL UNION
Charity number: 1044507

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Pierson | Chair | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Helen Burke | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charles Carter | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Pamela Corkill | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Irene Ilias | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irene Dorothy Clugston | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret WARE MBE | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN STEPHENSON | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Arabella Stuart | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.