Accounts and annual returns GOOD ENOUGH MOTHERING LIMITED

Charity Number: 1045094
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 March 2025 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required