GLOUCESTER UNIT 155 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Aim of the Sea Cadet Corps is to help young people towards responsible adulthood by encouraging valuable personal attributes and high standards of conduct, using a nautical theme based on the customs of the Royal Navy. Activities include community based work, pulling (rowing), sailing, shooting, drill, Expedition Training, football, swimming, kayaking, power boating.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 23 March 1995: Standard registration
- GLOUCESTER SEA CADETS (Working name)
- T.S GLOUCESTER (Working name)
- T S GLOUCESTER SEA CADET CORPS UNIT 155 (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs WJ Hazlewood | Chair | 16 October 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
Mitzi Watkins | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rui Laborda | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Luca Ferendeles | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jenna Leach | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
James Joyce | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Richard Allen | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Christopher Toner | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mr C Hill | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.09k | £34.83k | £19.34k | £21.01k | £25.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.61k | £11.59k | £12.57k | £12.99k | £26.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £24.67k | £11.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTER AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A
Albion Street
GLOUCESTER
GL1 1UE
- Phone:
- 01452520131
- Email:
- tsgloucester@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window