Financial history PREMISHLANER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1046945
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £183.61k £127.02k £78.65k £72.51k £19.13k
Total expenditure £192.88k £125.24k £52.89k £98.39k £17.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A