Financial history SUTTON ST JAMES TRUST

Charity number: 1047202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.85k £5.24k £1.69k £1.70k £1.73k
Total expenditure £11.88k £5.45k £1.74k £1.69k £1.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A