FYFIELD PRE SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
teaching local pre-school children in a controlled and happy environment in line with the EYFS curriculum
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 September 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 12 August 1995: Standard registration
- 09 May 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 09 May 2019: Funds transferred to 1052061 ESSEX COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
- FYFIELD PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/09/2014 | 03/09/2015 | 03/09/2016 | 03/09/2017 | 03/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.12k | £52.46k | £83.98k | £78.67k | £24.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.52k | £52.46k | £83.98k | £81.57k | £24.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £60.95k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 September 2018 | 09 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 September 2017 | 01 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
03 September 2017
(These accounts |
01 July 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 03 September 2016 | 27 July 2017 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
03 September 2016
(These accounts |
27 July 2017 | 24 days late | |
Annual return | 03 September 2015 | 15 July 2016 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
03 September 2015
(These accounts |
15 July 2016 | 12 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PPA PLAYGROUP CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST DECEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window