THE FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL THE ARCHANGEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides for maintenance repair & renewal of fabric of St. Michael The Arch Angel, Compton Martin church & church room.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 14 August 1995: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA CAROL SIMCOCK | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Dr AXEL ANTHONY PALMER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
NICHOLAS RICHARD HYDE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JAMES ROLAND BRAGG | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MARK JONATHAN SUMPTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BRETT DAVID HALLING BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239 | £225 | £227 | £278 | £114 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £40 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 June 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 May 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY MAINTAINING REPAIRING RESTORING PREERVING IMPROVEING BEAUTIFYING AND RECONSTRUCING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST MICHAEL THE ARCHANGEL COMPTON MARTIN ITS MONUMENTS FIXTURES FITTINGS FURNITURE STAINED GLASS ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS CHURCH ROOM AND ITS CHURCHYARD
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE COMPTON MARTIN, AVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
BICKFIELD HOUSE
BICKFIELD LANE
COMPTON MARTIN
BRISTOL
BS40 6NF
- Phone:
- 07970539387
- Email:
- JAMESBRAGG44@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window