ONEBODYONEFAITH LTD.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OneBodyOneFaith works for the full inclusion of gay, lesbian, bisexual and trans people in the Christian churches. We help churches to have intelligent and compassionate conversations about sexuality and gender identity, and we want individuals to be able to integrate their sexuality, gender identity and spirituality in ways which are bring the fullness of life promised in the Gospel of Jesus.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 August 1995: Standard registration
- LESBIAN AND GAY CHRISTIAN MOVEMENT (Working name)
- LESBIAN AND GAY CHRISTIANS (Working name)
- LGCM (Working name)
- ONEBODYONEFAITH (Working name)
- L G C M (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Edward Lord | Trustee | 14 December 2024 |
|
|||||||
George Isaac Anderson White | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Adelard Kananira | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Hannah Brock Womack | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Mark Rowland | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
Joanna Winn-Smith | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.06k | £57.39k | £69.44k | £159.17k | £111.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.75k | £53.69k | £56.36k | £61.92k | £85.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 AUGUST 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 MAY 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 MAY 2017 as amended on 12 Sep 2020 as amended on 01 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST LESBIANS AND GAY CHRISTIANS (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST SUCH PERSONS IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO CHRISTIANITY AND SEXUALITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND A TELEPHONE HELPLINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
OneBodyOneFaith
15 Newland
LINCOLN
LN1 1XG
- Phone:
- 01636 673072
- Email:
- hello@onebodyonefaith.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window