BASILDON AND THURROCK UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve the overall patient experience provided by Basildon and Thurrock University Hospitals NHS Foundation Trust and to achieve this end it will improve the hospital environment, the equipment available to treat or look after patients and the skills of the hospital personnel
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 November 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 March 2001: Standard registration
- 16 May 2022: Removed (Removed by application)
- BASILDON AND THURROCK GENERAL HOSPITALS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 20/11/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £618.58k | £312.22k | £954.21k | £467.42k | £130.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £460.82k | £398.37k | £526.11k | £445.59k | £2.07m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £397.40k | N/A | £748.55k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £195.78k | N/A | £174.04k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £25.40k | N/A | £31.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £252.49k | N/A | £529.33k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £329.47k | N/A | £396.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £74.86k | N/A | £129.89k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £56.49k | N/A | £53.94k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £111.27k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 November 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 20 November 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 20 November 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
20 November 2020
(These accounts |
01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 July 2021 | 178 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
28 July 2021 | 178 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28/06/1995
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ACCIDENT AND EMERGENCY
- ANAESTHESIA AND ALLIED SERVICES
- BASILDON AND THURROCK UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS CHARITABLE TRUST GENERAL PURPOSES FUND
- ELDERLY, OUTPATIENTS AND ASSOCIATED SERVICES
- GENERAL MEDICINE
- GENERAL SURGERY
- IMAGING SERVICES
- OBSTETRICS, GYNAECOLOGY AND PAEDIATRICS
- PATHOLOGY CHARITY
- THE BASILDON AND THURROCK GENERAL HOSPITALS NHS TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- TRAUMA AND ORTHOPAEDICS
- 06 March 2001 : Standard registration
- 16 May 2022 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window