Financial history HARRISON'S CHARITY FOR LEEDS CITY PARISH

Charity number: 1049969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.85k £14.94k £15.43k £15.45k £15.95k
Total expenditure £12.25k £17.29k £17.01k £16.99k £16.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A