THE ROSALIND HICKS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1050135
Charity reporting is up to date (40 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides grants to charitable organisations

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £46,708
Total expenditure: £65,301

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City
  • Cornwall
  • Devon
  • Dorset
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 October 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES PRICHARD Trustee 30 January 2013
THE AGATHA CHRISTIE TRUST FOR CHILDREN
Received: 2 days late
THE CHRISTIE ARCHIVE TRUST
Received: On time
JOHN MICHAEL MALLOWAN Trustee 30 January 2013
None on record
CHRISTOPHER DUNCAN HART Trustee 12 September 2012
AGATHA CHRISTIE FESTIVAL LIMITED
Received: On time
THE MARILLIER ANNUITY FUND
Received: On time
THE AGATHA CHRISTIE TRUST FOR CHILDREN
Received: 2 days late
ALEXANDRA CLEMENTSON Trustee
None on record
Nigel James Wollen Trustee
NAN AND JOHN SMITHES 1997 CHARITABLE TRUST - MELRO DE SMITHES WOOD
Received: On time
THE CHRISTIE ARCHIVE TRUST
Received: On time
THE MARJORIE AND GEOFFREY JONES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £23.53k £29.19k £42.32k £38.71k £46.71k
Total expenditure £31.55k £14.63k £57.37k £63.28k £65.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 05 February 2025 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 07 February 2025 40 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 20 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 20 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 08 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 01 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 01 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
AT HARBOURSIDE
67 THE TERRACE
TORQUAY
DEVON
TQ1 1DP
Phone:
01803213251
Website:

No information available