HULL YFC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have worked in one of Hull's most deprived communities since 1994. We provide long-term support to children and families helping them overcome problems linked to living in poverty. Our committed staff live in the community enabling us to fully understand its needs and form trusting relationships. This simple approach means we are invited to support those that most professionals fail to engage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 27 October 1995: Standard registration
- HULL YOUTH FOR CHRIST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW MICHAEL DORTON | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Stephen Moore | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Jillian Barton | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Andrew Tillotson | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Peter Court | Trustee | 04 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
CATHERINE WESTBY | Trustee | 13 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.94k | £70.88k | £158.15k | £105.45k | £132.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.59k | £79.76k | £109.78k | £117.58k | £136.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.21k | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 MAR 1995 AS AMENDED ON 14 NOV 2001 AS AMENDED ON 02 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED ON 27 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
A.TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO PROCLAIM THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST. B.TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE CHRISTIAN EVANGELISATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE. C.TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE POSITIVE CHRISTIAN LIVING. D.TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS THEREBY DEMONSTRATING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST.
Area of benefit
HULL AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Boulevard Baptist Church
Gordon Street
Hull
HU3 3HJ
- Phone:
- 01482221059
- Email:
- office@hullyfc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window