THE ANGLIA SINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Choir performing 3-4 concerts pa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 14 December 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Brisley | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Barry Crawford | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Arber | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.46k | £1.89k | £2.55k | £3.68k | £5.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.58k | £439 | £2.78k | £3.94k | £5.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 14TH OCTOBER 1994 (AS AMENDED ON 29TH SEPTEMBER 1995) AS AMENDED ON 09 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE ,IMPROVE , DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS WITHIN THE ESSEX AREA AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME. (2) TO MAKE SUCH GRANTS OR DONATIONS TOWARDS OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 The Green
Writtle
Chelmsford
CM1 3DT
- Phone:
- 01245 420969
- Email:
- sbrisp@talktalk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window