GLOUCESTERSHIRE HOSPITALS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
for any charitable purpose or purposes relating to the NHS ,wholly or mainly for the service provided by the Gloucestershire Hospitals NHS Foundation Trust
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,940,000
Donations and legacies | £1.01m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £204.00k | |
Other | £728.00k |
Total expenditure:
£2,458,000
Raising funds | £502.00k | |
Charitable activities | £1.96m | |
Other | £0 |
£67,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £502.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.96m |
People

11 Employee(s)
1 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- CHELTENHAM AND GLOUCESTER HOSPITALS CHARITY (Working name)
- GLOUCESTERSHIRE HOSPITALS NHS TRUST GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gloucestershire Hospitals NHS Foundation Trust | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.15m | £2.39m | £1.38m | £1.35m | £1.94m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00m | £1.41m | £2.30m | £1.91m | £2.46m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.07m | £2.33m | £1.31m | £1.22m | £1.01m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £79.00k | £60.00k | £66.00k | £127.00k | £204.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £728.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £779.00k | £868.00k | £444.00k | £442.00k | £369.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.72m | £1.24m | £2.01m | £1.54m | £1.96m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £280.00k | £175.00k | £294.00k | £366.00k | £502.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £139.00k | £0 | £108.00k | £152.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £1.10m | £0 | £1.44m | £1.80m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £10.00k | £9.00k | £9.00k | £8.00k | £8.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.74m | £2.02m | £2.06m | £1.89m | £1.94m | |
|
Other assets | £2.99m | £3.75m | £3.27m | £2.38m | £1.80m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £430.00k | £202.00k | £631.00k | £301.00k | £234.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 28 JULY 2003 AND 15 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE. WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR THE SERVICE PROVIDED BY THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE HOSPITALS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- BOURTON ON THE WATER HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- BROKENBOROUGH FUND
- CHELTENHAM GENERAL HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- CIRENCESTER HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- DELANCEY HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- EAST GLOUCESTERSHIRE NHS TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND
- EAST GLOUCESTERSHIRE NHS TRUST GENERAL STAFF WELFARE FUND
- EAST GLOUCESTERSHIRE NHS TRUST KINGSLAND FUND
- EAST GLOUCESTERSHIRE NHS TRUST LESLIE YOUNG FUND
- EAST GLOUCESTERSHIRE NHS TRUST MENTAL HEALTH AND LEARNING DISABILITIES GENERAL FUND
- FAIRFORD HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- GLOUCESTERSHIRE HOSPITALS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- GLOUCESTERSHIRE ROYAL HOSPITAL GENERAL CHARITY
- J PAGE FUND
- MORETON IN MARSH HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- NICOLE BRODERICK FUND
- POST GRADUATE MEDICAL CENTRE GENERAL FUND
- STANDISH HOSPITAL GENERAL CHARITY
- TEWKESBURY HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- WINCHCOMBE HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- 14 May 1996 : Standard registration
- 24 November 2004 : Removed
- 24 November 2004 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
Charitable Fund Office
Cheltenham General Hospital
Cheltenham
GL53 7AN
- Phone:
- 0300 422 3231
- Email:
- jean.mustoe@nhs.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window