THE TRUST FOR THE FRIENDS OF HOOTON PAGNELL ALL SAINTS CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity was set up to help with running costs of All Saints Church and also to help with the maintenance and any renovation required on this grade 1 listed church of 1070. It can also provide funds to help all people to access the church for religious/arts/culture/heritage meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Doncaster
Governance
- 22 December 1995: Standard registration
- TRUST FOR THE FRIENDS OF HOOTON PAGNELL ALL SAINTS CHURCH (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Warde-Norbury | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR JEFF COOKE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.99k | £29.10k | £300 | £2.55k | £7.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.37k | £48.24k | £7.23k | £2.48k | £1.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION BY PROMOTING, AIDING AND FURTHERING CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gardeners Cottage
Hooton Pagnell
DONCASTER
DN5 7BW
- Phone:
- 01977642350
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window