MEXBOROUGH NEW LIFE CHURCH
Charity number: 1052557
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday Fellowship Meetings and midweek fellowship meetings at various homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income: £8,567
Total expenditure: £5,527
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
Governance
Registration history:
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.04k | £5.84k | £5.02k | £5.51k | £8.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.67k | £5.72k | £7.10k | £6.55k | £5.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 30 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 11 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 13 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE MEXBOROUGH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window