Financial history CHAPTER TWO

Charity number: 1053047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £208.62k £243.82k £205.58k £326.70k £296.90k
Total expenditure £192.28k £208.58k £236.13k £342.89k £331.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A