Go Live Theatre Projects

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CREATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED TO ENGAGE WITH LONDON'S THEATRE THROUGH PROGRAMS DESIGNED FOR SCHOOLS (MAINSTREAM & SPECIAL), YOUTH GROUPS AND FAMILIES. EACH PROGRAMME INCLUDES A THEATRE TRIP ENHANCED WITH TALKS, EDUCATION PROGRAMMES, COMMUNITY WORKSHOPS, USING THEATRE AS A CATALYST TO EXPLORE IDEAS, LEARN NEW SKILLS AND OFFER NEW PERSPECTIVES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£999,993
Donations and legacies | £256.52k | |
Charitable activities | £666.18k | |
Other trading activities | £70.61k | |
Investments | £6.69k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,001,139
Raising funds | £217.30k | |
Charitable activities | £783.84k | |
Other | £0 |
-£20,247 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £9,700 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £217.30k | |
Charitable expenditure | £783.84k |
People

13 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 February 1996: Standard registration
- 20 December 2024: Funds received from 1121787 HONEYMEAD ARTS TRUST
- MOUSETRAP THEATRE PROJECTS (Working name)
- TEACHERS PREVIEW CLUB (Previous name)
- THE MOUSETRAP FOUNDATION FOR THE ARTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Prideaux | Chair | 27 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Darcy Dixon | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Tuffee | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvette Jarvis | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Esther May Myers | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roy Williams OBE | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Kenwright | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Alan Siegel | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Burke | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Michael Christopher Tabor | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA SULLIVAN | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Herman | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £816.52k | £772.93k | £712.94k | £968.01k | £999.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £879.36k | £768.29k | £688.95k | £956.23k | £1.00m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £64.35k | £45.55k | £1.39k | £9.70k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £273.80k | £291.24k | £351.40k | £465.42k | £256.52k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £22.66k | £6.68k | £0 | £2.92k | £70.61k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £471.93k | £410.38k | £358.71k | £494.75k | £666.18k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £283 | £2.83k | £3.53k | £6.69k | |
|
Income - Other | £48.14k | £64.35k | £0 | £1.39k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £3.11k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £700.51k | £503.99k | £513.23k | £693.29k | £783.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £178.85k | £170.73k | £175.72k | £261.54k | £217.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.25k | £9.29k | £6.40k | £8.29k | £4.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £370 | £606 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £93.57k | £0 | £1.39k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £30.73k | £28.55k | £21.53k | £17.62k | £11.92k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £74.75k | £77.68k | £84.16k | £319.79k | |
|
Other assets | £455.22k | £391.41k | £458.03k | £425.35k | £185.24k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £40.48k | £44.16k | £81.86k | £36.86k | £48.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/02/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/02/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29/02/2012 as amended on 31 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, DANCE, MUSIC AND VISUAL ARTS AND TO FORMULATE PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFORE INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVLEY, PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. (B) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ARTS PRACTITIONERS AND TEACHERS TO FURTHER DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS IN DELIVERING ARTS EDUCATION (C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTIVES IN SUPPORT OF THE ARTS AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE COMPANY MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE (D) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTIVES GENERALLY AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE COMPANY MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fivefields
8-10 Grosvenor Gardens
LONDON
SW1W 0DH
- Phone:
- 02076324111
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window