THE ECCLESIASTICAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1053883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance public education in Ecclesiastical History, mainly through conferences and publications.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £47,343
Total expenditure: £41,719

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Isle Of Man
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 March 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Prof Michael Francis Snape Chair 20 July 2023
THE MUSEUM OF THE ROYAL ARMY CHAPLAINS DEPARTMENT CIO
Received: On time
Dr Michael Fraser Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Dr Felicity Gemma Hill Trustee 19 July 2023
None on record
Dr Joseph Richard Hardwick Trustee 19 July 2023
None on record
Dr Laura Marilyn Mair Trustee 19 July 2023
None on record
Prof David Ceri Jones Trustee 19 July 2023
None on record
Dr Emilie Katie Maria Murphy Trustee 19 July 2023
None on record
Dr Edmund Wareham Trustee 19 July 2023
None on record
Dr Angela Platt Trustee 20 July 2022
None on record
Dr Hilary Carey Trustee 20 July 2022
None on record
Dr Peter Marshall Trustee 20 July 2022
None on record
Dr Anna Louise French Trustee 22 July 2021
None on record
Dr Geraldine Vaughan Trustee 16 July 2019
None on record
SIMON JENNINGS MA FCA Trustee
GIFT OF LIFE
Received: On time
THE OLD BROAD STREET CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS THE WONDERWORKER
Received: On time
THE INSTITUTE FOR ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN STUDIES
Received: 131 days late
The Orthodox Parish of St Nicholas, Oxford
Received: On time
THE METROPOLITAN KALLISTOS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
REVD DR CHARLOTTE MARY METHUEN Trustee
AFFIRMING CATHOLICISM
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF SAINT WILLIBRORD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.37k £26.63k £29.21k £38.01k £47.34k
Total expenditure £45.46k £24.82k £25.22k £43.24k £41.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 March 2021 38 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 Warwick Street
OXFORD
OX4 1SX
Phone:
07860493718