CARALINE: EATING DISORDERS COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established in February I994, CARALINE provides a confidential counselling and support service for people with anorexia nervosa, bulimia nervosa, binge eating disorder, OSFED and other eating disorders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £468,504 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Luton
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 19 March 1996: Standard registration
- 09 November 2021: Funds received from 1078359 DUNSTABLE AND DISTRICT DISABLED SPORTS
- CARALINE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY DENISE WHIPP | Chair | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Anne Lister | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Melissa Smith | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grace Ambrose | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARA ANNE YEARWOOD | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JACKSON | Trustee | 07 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.14k | £329.00k | £377.46k | £440.49k | £487.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.11k | £284.88k | £440.39k | £432.41k | £359.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £243.18k | £270.58k | £374.17k | £387.25k | £468.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.49k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 NOVEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED 28 FEBRUARY 1996 AS AMENDED 16 FEBRUARY 2000 AND 25 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM ANOREXIA OR BULIMIA NERVOSA IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A CONFIDENTIAL COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT SERVICE WITHIN NON-STIGMATISING SURROUNDINGS. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS BY THE PROVISION OF AN ACCESSIBLE ALTERNATIVE TO HOSPITAL-BASED CARE IN ORDER TO REDUCE BOTH THE NECESSITY FOR ADMISSION TO A PSYCHIATRIC HOSPITAL AND THE DURATION OF THE LENGTH OF IN-PATIENT CARE FOR THOSE ADMITTED. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF THE FAMILIES OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANOREXIA OR BULIMIA NERVOSA. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST SUFFERERS, CARERS, PROFESSIONALS AND THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF AN EDUCATION SERVICE WHICH OFFERS INFORMATION AND SKILLS-BASED LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES RELATING TO ANOREXIA NERVOSA, BULIMIA NERVOSA AND ASSOCIATED MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Caraline Eating Disorders
Kline House
13 George Street West
Luton
LU1 2BJ
- Phone:
- 01582457474
- Email:
- admin@caraline.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window